State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Traxxas LP et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, H. Suzanne Osborne, Robert Osborne and Andrew Osborne
Defendant: AMAIN.COM, INC. t/d/b/a PROTEK RC, Ed's RC, LLC, Traxxas LP, HRP Distributing Co. and AMAIN.COM INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00271
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT TRAXXAS, L.P.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL [DKT. NO. #24 ]. The Court GRANTS Traxxas's motion for leave to file the Redaction Reference List under seal and DIRECTS the Clerk to file the Redaction Reference List under seal. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/4/2021. (wrr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to file Document Nunc Pro Tunc re #1 Notice of Removal, by Traxxas LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Exhibit CM/ECF Filing Document, #4 Exhibit Correspondence and Documents, #5 Exhibit Correspondence and Documents, #6 Proposed Order Order)(Bolen, J.)
February 3, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Andrew Osborne, H. Suzanne Osborne, Robert Osborne, Robert Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law)(Crim, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION leave to file Redaction Reference List under seal by Traxxas LP. (Attachments: #1 Index Proposed Order)(Bolen, J.)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/29/2021. (dk)
January 28, 2021 Filing 22 Declaration of Corporate Citizenship of Traxxas, L.P. Other Document filed by Traxxas LP. (Bolen, J.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Crim on behalf of Andrew Osborne, H. Suzanne Osborne, Robert Osborne, Robert Osborne (Crim, Michael)
January 27, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re ERROR: All plaintiffs were not added at case opening. CORRECTION: Added separate plaintiffs that were listed on the Amended Complaint attached to #1 Notice. (cmd)
January 27, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Status Conference held on 1/27/2021. (Court Reporter Jill Cutter) (dk)
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HRP Distributing Co.. (Houghton, Stephen)
January 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Houghton on behalf of HRP Distributing Co. (Houghton, Stephen)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for PHV William H. Fry. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/22/2021. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
January 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ed's RC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Warner, Brian) Modified on 1/14/2021 to restrict to case participants per IMK (wrr). Modified on 1/29/2021 to unseal per #23 Order. (dk)
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Warner on behalf of Ed's RC, LLC (Warner, Brian)
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to William H. Fry PAID: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003096. (wrr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Traxxas LP of Filing State Court Document Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1446(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Approve Settlement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Setting Hearing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order of Dismissal as to Ed's RC, LLC)(Bolen, J.) Modified on 1/13/2021 to restrict as to case participants per IMK (wrr). Modified on 1/29/2021 to unseal per #23 Order. (dk)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William H. Fry by AMAIN.COM INC., AMAIN.COM, INC.. (Rich, David)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 *SEALED* REPORT of Mediator.(wrr)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAIN.COM INC.. (Rich, David)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rosenberg, David)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER RESCHEDULING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE. For reasons appearing to the Court, the status conference previously set for 1/14/21 is RESCHEDULED to 1/27/2021, at 10:00 AM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. The Court will connect to the call utilizing the conference call information previously provided by counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/23/2020. (dk)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Traxxas LP. (Bolen, J.)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Jonathan P. Saxton. (wrr)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Rosenberg on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rosenberg, David)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court SCHEDULES a telephone status conference in the above-captioned matter for Thursday, January 14, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., to address the Court's jurisdiction over this case. The Court DIRECTS counsel for the Defendant, Traxxas LP, to arrange the conference call and provide dial-in information to all parties and the Court no later than January 7, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/15/2020. (wrr)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to David J. Rosenberg. (wrr)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Harrison County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-51), filed by Traxxas LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $402. Receipt #0424-3170911. (Restricted as to case participants per IMK.)(wrr) Modified on 1/29/2021 to unseal per #23 Order. (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Traxxas LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Benjamin M. Mishoe
Represented By: David J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Suzanne Osborne
Represented By: Michael D. Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Osborne
Represented By: Michael D. Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Osborne
Represented By: Michael D. Crim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAIN.COM, INC. t/d/b/a PROTEK RC
Represented By: William H. Fry
Represented By: Jonathan P. Saxton
Represented By: David E. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed's RC, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traxxas LP
Represented By: J. David Bolen
Represented By: Ellen Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRP Distributing Co.
Represented By: Stephen M. Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAIN.COM INC.
Represented By: William H. Fry
Represented By: Jonathan P. Saxton
Represented By: David E. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?