Brown v. Babach et al
Plaintiff: James Arnold Brown
Defendant: Captain Sams, L.R. Babach and Captain Leary
Case Number: 1:2020cv00273
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff Clarifying Intent re #13 Order filed by James Arnold Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/19/2021. (jmm)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CLARIFY INTENT. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to clarify his intent regarding this case within 14 days from the date of service of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 1/15/2021. (copy Pro Se Plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
January 14, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER from James Brown to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Arnold Brown. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheet, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/11/2021. (jmm)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER by James Arnold Brown. (Attachments: #1 copy of notice of Deficient, #2 Envelope)(jmm) Modified on 1/11/2021 clerk directed to change to a letter per MJA(jmm).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The plaintiff has 14 DAYS from the date of this Order to show cause why his case should not be dismissed for the failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 1/7/2021. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT, #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/17/2020. (jmm)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 PTAR) (To PS Plaintiff by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Plaintiff by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by James Arnold Brown. (dk)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Arnold Brown (unsigned). (dk)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Arnold Brown. (dk)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Arnold Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Babach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arnold Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Sams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.R. Babach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?