Cole v. McCall
Plaintiff: James Cole
Defendant: Case Mgr. McCall
Case Number: 1:2021cv00009
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/16/21. (jss)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case. The Court dismisses this case without prejudice. (copy cmrr) Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/9/21. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by James Cole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter)(jss)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other) and #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/28/21 per USPS website. (jss)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading. (Attachments: #1 IFP application, #2 PTAR, #3 Consent to Collection, #4 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCall filed by James Cole. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Letter (copy returned), #3 Envelope)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Mgr. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?