West Virginia University Board of Governors v. Sports Fanz, LLC et al
Plaintiff: West Virginia University Board of Governors
Defendant: Chad Rogers and Sports Fanz, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00025
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Evelina Gentry) by Chad Rogers, Sports Fanz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simmerman, Frank)
April 9, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Thomas G. Pasternak) by Chad Rogers, Sports Fanz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simmerman, Frank)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 5/7/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/21/2021. Discovery due by 6/7/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/7/2021. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Edward Simmerman, III on behalf of All Defendants (Simmerman, Frank)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer and/or Othrewise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chad Rogers, Sports Fanz, LLC. (Simmerman, Frank)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Chad Rogers served on 3/19/2021. (Harvey, Ronda)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sports Fanz, LLC served on 3/16/2021. (mh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jmm)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cecilia R. Dickson. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/25/2021. (wrr)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony W. Brooks. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/25/2021. (wrr)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW02678 for attorney A. Brooks and C. Dickson. (jmm)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Anthony W. Brooks by West Virginia University Board of Governors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Ronda)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cecilia R. Dickson by West Virginia University Board of Governors. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Ronda)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kac)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Anthony W. Brooks ands Cecilia R. Dickson via email. (jmm)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chad Rogers, Sports Fanz, LLC, filed by West Virginia University Board of Governors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)Filing Fee PAID $402. Receipt #0424-3204605.(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Virginia University Board of Governors v. Sports Fanz, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Rogers
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Represented By: Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Pasternak
Represented By: Frank Edward Simmerman, III
Represented By: Chad L Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Fanz, LLC
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Represented By: Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Pasternak
Represented By: Frank Edward Simmerman, III
Represented By: Chad L Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia University Board of Governors
Represented By: Anthony W. Brooks
Represented By: Cecilia R. Dickson
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?