Friend v. Gabrielse
Plaintiff: Nicole S. Friend
Defendant: Samuel James Gabrielse
Not Classified By Court: GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00044
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicole S. Friend re #7 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Responses to Def Gabrielse's 1st Set of Requests for Production of Documents. (Williams, Jacques)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Moore, R.)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Samuel James Gabrielse 's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Nicole S. Friend. (Moore, R.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Warner on behalf of GEICO Choice Insurance Company (Warner, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Kearns on behalf of GEICO Choice Insurance Company (Kearns, Justin)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (dk)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/2/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/16/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2021 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 7/12/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 4/6/2021. (dk)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Samuel James Gabrielse.(Moore, R.)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, (case number 21-C-49), filed by Samuel James Gabrielse. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #0424-3232062. (Attachments: #1 EXhibit A - State Court Papers, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Proof of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friend v. Gabrielse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel James Gabrielse
Represented By: Laurie C. Barbe
Represented By: R. Mitchell Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole S. Friend
Represented By: Jacques R. Williams
Represented By: Andrew G. Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin Michael Kearns
Represented By: Brian J. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?