McCoy v. Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly L. McCoy
Defendant: Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc. and Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00047
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (Cohen, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc..(Anderson, Eric)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING PARTIES STIPULATION EXTENDING TIMEFRAME FOR ANSWER [DKT. NO. #9 : Defendants must respond to and/or answer the Complaint by May 20, 2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/7/21. (jss)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR ASTORG AUTO OF CHARLESTON, INC. TO PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc., Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Anderson, Eric)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric N. Anderson on behalf of Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc. (Anderson, Eric)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Anderson, Eric)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 5/27/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/10/2021. Discovery due by 6/25/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/26/21. (jss)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric N. Anderson on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Anderson, Eric)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC served on 4/19/2021. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc. served on 4/19/2021. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astorg Auto of Charleston, Inc.
Represented By: Eric N. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Eric N. Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly L. McCoy
Represented By: Jeffrey V. Mehalic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?