Anderson et al v. FDF Energy Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Chase Anderson and Mary Jane Anderson
Defendant: FDF Energy Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00062
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chase Anderson, Mary Jane Anderson Plaintiffs' First Set of Combined Discovery to Defendant. (Bosak, David)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder and Amendments due by 8/27/2021; Discovery due by 2/25/2022; Motions due by 3/28/2022; Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2022 11:00 AM in Clarksburg; Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 8/16/2022 09:30 AM in Clarksburg. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/2/2021. (nmm)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FDF Energy Services, LLC Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs. (Brennan, Julie)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Report of Parties Initial Planning Meeting Other Document filed by FDF Energy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order Checklist)(Brennan, Julie)
June 19, 2021 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM?ECF system to Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen Cm/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have thei r own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-fling account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Please log in to the WVND CM/ECF system at https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/ before July 19, 2021 to make sure you know your current WVND e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVND Clerks CM/ECF Office Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 30, 2021 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by FDF Energy Services, LLC.(Brennan, Julie)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/14/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2021. Discovery due by 7/14/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/12/21. (mh)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Pleasants County Circuit Court, (case number 21-C-5), filed by FDF Energy Services, LLC. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #0424-3256155. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court docket sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. FDF Energy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Anderson
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: Timothy C Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Anderson
Represented By: David A. Bosak
Represented By: Timothy C Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDF Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Represented By: Julie A. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?