Heater v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Steven Heater
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00067
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Instructions for linking your account can be found #here. PLEASE NOTE: The WVND CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 1:00 pm on Friday July 16, 2021 until 8:00 am Monday, July 19, 2021. An extension for electronic filing will be granted for all documents with court-imposed deadlines falling between 1:00 pm on Friday, July 16, 2021, and midnight on Sunday, July 18, 2021. All documents due during that period must be filed prior to 1:00 pm Friday, July 16, 2021, or on Monday, July 19, 2021. If you have any additional questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
June 19, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM?ECF system to Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen Cm/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have thei r own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-fling account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Please log in to the WVND CM/ECF system at https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/ before July 19, 2021 to make sure you know your current WVND e-filing login and password. Do not rely on your username and password being saved in your web browser, because that method will not work with the NextGen upgrade. If you do not know your login or password or have any additional questions please call the WVND Clerks CM/ECF Office Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dana W. Duncan. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/2/2021. (jmm)
May 30, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Dana Duncan: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002751 (jss)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TOPROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 5/24/21. (jss)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Heater. (Bailey, Brian)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steven Heater. (cnd)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Steven Heater. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sumons - Office of Regional Counsel, #3 Summons - USA NDWV, #4 Summons - US Attorney General)[Kleeh/Trumble](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heater v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Heater
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?