Stover et al v. Folse
Petitioner: Teddy Stover and Jama Stover
Respondent: Jay Folse
Interested Party: BOKF NA D/B/A Homedirect Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2021cv00110
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND BE GRANTED. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs pendingMotion to Remand ECF No. #7 be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/1/2021. (copy counsel of record, copy pro se party via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jama Stover, Teddy Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cardi, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER and envelope from Attorney Seth Hayes to MJ Aloi regarding #22 Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge. (mh)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND BE GRANTED re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Teddy Stover, Jama Stover. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/16/21. (mh) (Copy PS Party via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REMAND re #7 MOTION to Remand . (mh)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT RESPONSE ECF NO. #26 AND DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE RESPONSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/16/21. (mh) (Copy PS Party via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CHANGING LOCATION OF JURY TRIAL. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/16/21. (mh) (Copy PS Party via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Supplement Respondent's Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Jay Folse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Response, #2 Facsimile Cover Sheet)(mh)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/13/2021. (dk)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jama Stover, Teddy Stover. (Cardi, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2021. Discovery due by 3/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/29/2022. Final Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 8/4/2022 10:00 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 8/9/2022 09:30 AM in Clarksburg Bankruptcy Courtroom before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/9/21. (mh) (Copy PS Def via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ECF NO. #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/9/21. (Copy PS Def via cert mail; copy mailed to Seth Hayes)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jama Stover, Teddy Stover Acceptance of Service (Jacintha Nwoko, Interested Party) (Cardi, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/3/21. (mh)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J. Kimble on behalf of BOKF NA D/B/A Homedirect Mortgage (Kimble, Kelly)
September 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONDENTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION TO REMAND #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jay Folse. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)(jmm)
September 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONDENTS ANSWER AND MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION by Jay Folse. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)(jmm)
September 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY DISTRICT JUDGE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Jay Folse. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)(jmm)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cardi, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Mail sent to Jay Folse #6 First Order Returned as Undeliverable. (dk)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Mail sent to Jay Folse #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT, #4 ORDER OF REFERRAL, Returned as Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (wrr)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ROSEBORO NOTICE re #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand filed by Teddy Stover, Jama Stover. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/31/2021. (Copy PS Def by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand by Jama Stover, Teddy Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cardi, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Leave to Supplement Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, and directs Plaintiffs to file their supplement within two (2) days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/26/2021. (Mailed to PS Respondent via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Jama Stover, Teddy Stover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cardi, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Teddy Stover, Jama Stover. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/24/21. (mh) (Copy PS Def via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Jama Stover, Teddy Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cardi, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2021 09:00 AM by ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. (cmd)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/3/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/17/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2021 09:00 AM in by ZOOM for Govt. before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Aloi. Discovery due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/9/21. (To Pro Se party via cert mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). Modified on 8/10/2021 to correct scheduling conference hearing; regen NEF. (cmd)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Monongalia County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record cont'd, #2 State Court Record cont'd) (mh)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL referring this civil action to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/5/21. (mh) (Copy PS Petitioner via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Petitioner via cert mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/5/2021) (mh).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt numbers WVNC003279 ($400.00) and WVNC003280 ($2.00) (mh)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monongalia County Circuit Court, (case number 21-P-144), filed by Jay Folse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stover et al v. Folse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teddy Stover
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jama Stover
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jay Folse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BOKF NA D/B/A Homedirect Mortgage
Represented By: Kelly J. Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?