West Virginia University Board of Governors et al v. Plasma Igniter, LLC
Plaintiff: West Virginia University Board of Governors and West Virginia University Research Corporation
Defendant: Plasma Igniter, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00116
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ***SEALED***; ***SEALED***. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/12/2021. (Emailed to Counsel of Record) (dk)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Plasma Igniter, LLC served on 9/2/2021. (George, Edward)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Plasma Igniter, LLC, filed by West Virginia University Board of Governors, West Virginia University Research Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4Exhibit 4, #5Exhibit 5, #6Exhibit 6, #7Exhibit 7, #8Exhibit 8, #9Exhibit 9, #10Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12Exhibit 12, #13Exhibit 13, #14Exhibit 14, #15Exhibit 15, #16Exhibit 16, #17Exhibit 17, #18Exhibit 18, #19Exhibit 19, #20Exhibit 20, #21Exhibit 21, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee Paid $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3322766.(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Virginia University Board of Governors et al v. Plasma Igniter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia University Board of Governors
Represented By: Edward Joseph George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia University Research Corporation
Represented By: Edward Joseph George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plasma Igniter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?