Callahan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Melissa Ann Callahan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00113
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General served on 11/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed as to Commissioner of SS on 11/22/2022, #2 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney on 11/21/2022)(jmm)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 and #5 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/16/2022. (jb)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/12/2022. (jb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION #2 TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/10/2022. (Mailed to PS Plaintiff via CM, RRR. Copies to USM.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION [ #2 ] TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 11/9/2022. (Mailed to PS plaintiff. Copy to USM.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Copy sent to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM:RRR). (jb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jb).
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Ann Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jb)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Melissa Ann Callahan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment Proposed Summons, #4 Attachment Proposed Summons, #5 Envelope) (jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Ann Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?