Hughes v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Karen Hughes and Frank Hughes
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co., Icon Health and Fitness, Inc., John Doe and John Logar
Case Number: 2:2009cv00093
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Elkins Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER denying 150 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order but granting some other relief requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 7/7/11. (jss)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 115 Motion/Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees in the amount of $2,668.00. Objections may be filed within 14 days after being served with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 6/30/11. (cnd)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 65 Motion to Exclude Testimony of David J. Bizzak. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 12/16/10. (cnd)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 56 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 12/2/10. (jss)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 6 Motion to Sever as to John Logar, MD and it is remanded to the Circuit Court of Barbour County; denying 10 Motion to Remand claims against the remaining non-diverse defendants. (copy to Barbour County Circuit Court) Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/3/09. (jss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hughes
Represented By: James A. Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Hughes
Represented By: James A. Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears, Roebuck and Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Health and Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Logar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?