Depp v. Autozone Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Depp
Defendant: Autozone Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00100
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2019. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Motions due by 9/6/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2019 02:00 PM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection and jury trial set for 11/5/2019 08:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/15/18. (njz)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Spitz, Arie)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 PAPLESS NOTICE: Morris Caleb Davis has been admitted to practice before the NDWV on this date. (cmd)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Autozone Stores, Inc..(Spitz, Arie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Autozone Stores, Inc.. (Spitz, Arie)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/2/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/16/2018. Discovery due by 12/3/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/3/18. (njz)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION re: Morris C. Davis. (njz)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Randolph County (case number 18-C-87) filed by Autozone Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents including Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2677832(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depp v. Autozone Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Depp
Represented By: Morris C. Davis
Represented By: Morris Caleb Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Arie M Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?