Bates v. Coakley

Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Bates
Defendant: Joe Coakley and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00006
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 41.40, receipt number WVNE013716 (njz)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/7/19 per USPS. (njz)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #6 MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND DIRECTING CLERK TO TERMINATE JOE COAKLEY AS DEFENDANT AND SUBSTITUTE THE UNITED STATES. United States of America added. Joe Coakley (Warden) terminated. An initial partial filing fee of $41.40 is due. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to pay the initial filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days of the entry of this Order, could result in the dismissal of thisaction without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 3/4/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail, mailed to Trustee with executed consent to collection of fees form, and emailed to fin admin with executed consent to collection of fees form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 Envelope Received re: #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 . (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth R. Bates (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth R. Bates. (Attachments: #1 ledger)(njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Kenneth R. Bates. (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth R. Bates. (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth R. Bates. (Attachments: #1 various documents)(njz) Modified on 2/19/2019-attachment sealed per chambers (njz).
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice, #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/25/19 per USPS. (njz)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla, with FTCS forms, via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2019: #1 Attachment 1st page of FTCA, #2 Attachment 1st page of motion for ifp, #3 Attachment Consent, #4 Attachment PTAR, #5 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joe Coakley filed by Kenneth R. Bates. (Attachments: #1 Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death with medical records (sealed with permission from chambers), #2 Envelope). case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Mazzone, and LC Blalock(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Coakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Coakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?