Taylor v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Samuel Taylor
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00034
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Burns, Megan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Burns, Megan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Burns, Megan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:18-cv-00128-TSK; granting (19) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:18-cv-00132-TSK; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:18-cv-00133-TSK; granting (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:19-cv-00020-TSK; granting (6) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:19-cv-00034-TSK. The Court DESIGNATES 2:18-CV-128 as the lead case. The Court DIRECTS counsel and the Clerk to docket all documents relating to discovery and pretrial motions in the lead case. The Scheduling Order entered in 2:18-CV-128 [ECF No. 16] will govern the consolidated cases through discovery and pretrial motions. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/24/19.(njz)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Samuel Taylor. (Causey, Jason)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER INSTRUCTING PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. The Court ORDERS each of the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases to file a response on or before June 21, 2019 in his or her respective case, if he or she opposes the Motion to Consolidate. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/13/2019. (cmd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Manning, Jason)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Manning, Jason)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Manning on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Manning, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samuel Taylor. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC waiver sent on 5/28/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Causey, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Ex. A Other Document re #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Taylor. (Causey, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Samuel Taylor. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-2827702. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Taylor
Represented By: James G. Bordas, Jr.
Represented By: Jason E. Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Megan E. Burns
Represented By: Jason E. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?