Field v. Altria Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dale P. Field, Jr.
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Randolph County, West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Docket Entries)(Gunn, Jeremy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Attorney used incorrect event, Attorney refiled document (see docket entry #13 ) Letter to Clerk Other Document Docket filed by Altria Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Docket)(Gunn, Jeremy) Modified on 7/10/2019-nef regen (njz).
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Altria Group, Inc.. (Gunn, Jeremy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/5/19. (njz)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERRAL: REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/1/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dale P. Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION to Add Defendant by Dale P. Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 First Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/17/19. (njz)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/11/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2019. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/12/19. copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail(njz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Altria Group, Inc.. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Gunn, Jeremy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altria Group, Inc.. (Gunn, Jeremy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Alexander Gunn on behalf of Altria Group, Inc. (Gunn, Jeremy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Randolph County, (case number 2019-C-33) filed by Altria Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court documents including Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424- 2836566 (njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale P. Field, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Alexander Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?