Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A. v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A.
Defendant: Michael A. Thomas
Case Number: 2:2019cv00040
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael A. Thomas served on 8/25/2019. (Knobbe, Travis)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 WRONG EVENT USED. SEE DOC #6 . AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A.. (Knobbe, Travis) Modified on 8/27/2019-NEF REGEN (njz).
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A. of Change of Attorney Information (Knobbe, Travis)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A. (njz)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael A. Thomas filed by Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Fixed Rate Note, #2 Exhibit B-Revolving Variable Rate Note, #3 Exhibit C-Fixed Rate Note, #4 Exhibit D-Revolving Variable Rate Note, #5 Exhibit E-Fixed Rate Note, #6 Exhibit F-Fixed Rate Note, #7 Exhibit G-Fixed Rate Note, #8 Exhibit H-Nonrevolving Variable Rate Note, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2865616(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A. v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Credit of the Virginias, A.C.A.
Represented By: W. Eric Gadd
Represented By: Travis A. Knobbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?