E.H. v. Higginbotham
Plaintiff: E. H.
Defendant: Newton E. Higginbotham, III
Case Number: 2:2019cv00042
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/8/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/22/2019. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/9/19. (cnd)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL: District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh recused. Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/9/19. (cnd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint [sealed] by Newton E. Higginbotham, III.(Mullins, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Newton E. Higginbotham, III served on 9/13/2019. (Heavens, Christopher)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FILING PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/5/19. (email counsel)(cnd)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newton E. Higginbotham, III, filed by E. H.. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-2888682. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd) Modified on 9/5/2019 - sealed per #4 Order (cnd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.H. v. Higginbotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton E. Higginbotham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. H.
Represented By: Aaron M. Kidd
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?