Arnold et al v. U.S. Well Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Arnold and Maria Echeverria
Defendant: U.S. Well Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00034
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020. Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Motions due by 7/1/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2021 10:00 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Selection set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2021 09:30 AM in Elkins District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/9/2020. (cnd)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smallwood, Edward)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Well Services, LLC. (Bryson, Colby) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/24/2020) (njz). Modified on 8/24/2020-converted to pdf (njz).
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Affirmative defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Well Services, LLC.(Bryson, Colby)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/18/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/2/2020. Discovery due by 10/19/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/18/20. (njz)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Lewis County Circuit Court, (case number 20-C-55), filed by U.S. Well Services, LLC. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-3096837. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Docket sheet/Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold et al v. U.S. Well Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arnold
Represented By: Christopher J. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Echeverria
Represented By: Christopher J. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Well Services, LLC
Represented By: Colby S. Bryson
Represented By: Edward A Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?