Braxton v. City of Buckhannon et al
Plaintiff: Brice Braxton
Defendant: St. Josephs Hospital, City of Buckhannon, Deputy William Chidestor and Corporal Marshall O'Connor
Case Number: 2:2020cv00038
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for summons to be served by the Clerk, Motion to Expedite by Brice Braxton. (Attachments: #1 copy of order, #2 proposed summons, #3 fax sheet)(njz)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/15/20. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla with blank summonses via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/7/20. (jss)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Envelope Received re: #1 , #2 , 3 . (njz)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brice Braxton. (njz)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Chidestor, City of Buckhannon, O'Connor, St. Josephs Hospital filed by Brice Braxton. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braxton v. City of Buckhannon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brice Braxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Josephs Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Buckhannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy William Chidestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Marshall O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?