Jones v. Hardy Storage Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Lyn Jones
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, L.L.C. and Hardy Storage Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00043
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice as to Tonny Storey. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 11/18/20. (jss)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice as to Shiloh Daum. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 11/18/20. (jss)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for attorneys Shiloh Daum and Tonny Storey: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002612 (jss)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tonny D. Storey by Sherry Lyn Jones. (McHugh, James)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shiloh Daum by Sherry Lyn Jones. (McHugh, James) Modified on 11/10/2020 to correct docket text per counsel. (kac).
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbia Gas Transmission, L.L.C., Hardy Storage Company, LLC filed by Sherry Lyn Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3142244(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hardy Storage Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Lyn Jones
Represented By: James P. McHugh
Represented By: Christopher D. Pence
Represented By: Shiloh Daum
Represented By: Tonny D. Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardy Storage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?