Axel Braun Productions v. DOES 1- 7098 Featured Case
Plaintiff: Axel Braun Productions
Defendant: DOES 1- 7098
Case Number: 3:2010cv00112
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2011 Filing 28 RETURN RECEIPT as to 23 Order on Motion to Quash. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/14/2011. (tlg)
January 10, 2011 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
January 10, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Axel Braun Productions (Ford, Kenneth)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying as moot John Doe's 24 Motion to Quash Subpoena, as the Court severed and dismissed every Doe in this case except Doe 1 on 12/23/2010. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/4/2011. (tlg)
January 4, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, filed by John Doe No. 1. (tlg)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Denying as moot 19 Motion to Quash and Motion to Vacate ; denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 21 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/3/2011. Copy mailed to pro se John Doe by certified mail, return receipt.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2011: # 1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
December 27, 2010 Filing 18 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 17 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 16 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 15 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 14 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 13 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 12 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 11 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 10 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 9 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 8 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 27, 2010 Filing 7 Subpoena Other Document filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Ford, Kenneth)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: All defendants except John Doe No. 1 are severed from this action and the subpoenas are hereby quashed as to the severed defendants. DOES 2-7098 are terminated and this civil action is assigned to John Doe No. 1 as an individual defendant. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/23/2010. (tlg)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 3 FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/12/2010. (tlg)
November 10, 2010 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion for Discovery by Axel Braun Productions re 3 MOTION for Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Ford, Kenneth)
November 10, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery by Axel Braun Productions. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ford, Kenneth)
October 29, 2010 Filing 2 Filing fee: $350.00; receipt number 060978. (tlg)
October 29, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1- 7098, filed by Axel Braun Productions. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A, Part I, # 2 Schedule A, Part II, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axel Braun Productions v. DOES 1- 7098
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axel Braun Productions
Represented By: Kenneth J. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1- 7098
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?