Blingville, LLC v. Zynga Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Blingville, LLC
Defendant: Zynga Inc. and Zynga Game Network Inc.
Counter_claimant: Zynga Inc.
Counter_defendant: Blingville, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00004
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blingville, LLC Answers to Zynga's First Requests for Admission. (Novotny, Michael)
April 2, 2012 Filing 34 Case Reassigned to District Judge Gina M. Groh. Chief Judge John Preston Bailey no longer assigned to the case. (rjs)
March 23, 2012 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga Inc. of Supplemental Responses to Blingville, LLC's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Zynga Inc.. (Powell, William)
March 14, 2012 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. for Requests for Admissions to Blingville, LLC. (Powell, William)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 28 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/27/2012. (cwm)
January 18, 2012 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Game Network Inc. re 25 Certificate of Service for Zynga Inc.'s Response to Blingville, LLC's First Interrogatories and Request for Production to Zynga. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit cover letter sending complete discovery and documents to Blingville counsel)(Powell, William)
January 16, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE by Zynga Inc. of Deposition of Plaintiff Blingville, LLC (Powell, William)
January 9, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for Protective Order by Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Powell, William)
January 9, 2012 Filing 27 Zynga's Expert Witness Disclosure Other Document filed by Zynga Inc.. (Powell, William)
December 22, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE by Zynga Inc. of Deposition of Plaintiff Blingville, LLC (Powell, William)
November 16, 2011 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blingville, LLC Blingvilles First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Zynga. (Novotny, Michael)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 22 Motion to Extend Deadline for Expert Witness Disclosures. The deadline is extended to 1/8/2012 for the party with the burden and extended to 2/8/2012 for the party without the burden. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/14/2011. (tlg)
November 1, 2011 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blingville, LLC Plaintiffs Answers to Zynga First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and Things. (Novotny, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery i.e., Expert Witness Disclosures by Zynga Inc.. (Powell, William)
September 16, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. for their First Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Blingville, Inc.. (Powell, William)
September 16, 2011 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. for their First Interrogatories to Blingville, LLC. (Powell, William)
June 1, 2011 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blingville, LLC Pre-Discovery Disclosures (Novotny, Michael)
June 1, 2011 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures Other Document filed by Zynga Inc.. (Powell, William)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2011. Discovery due by 5/8/2012. Motions due by 5/22/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/22/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2012 02:00 PM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 7/17/2012 08:30 AM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John Preston Bailey. As a final matter, the May 6, 2011, Scheduling Conference set by Order dated March 10, 2011 [Doc. 12], is hereby VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/13/11. (cwm)
April 11, 2011 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Powell, William)
March 28, 2011 Filing 15 Answer ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Counterclaims by Blingville, LLC.(Novotny, Michael)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dennis Wilson. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/24/11. (cwm)
March 16, 2011 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blingville, LLC. (Novotny, Michael)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/11/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/25/2011. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2011 02:00 PM before Chief Judge John Preston Bailey. Discovery due by 5/11/2011. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/10/11. (njz)
March 8, 2011 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for attorney Dennis Wilson: $ 100.00, receipt number 064475. (cmd) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/11/2011) (cmd). Modified on 3/11/2011 - Corrected receipt which had the receipt number torn off and regenerated NEF. (cmd)
March 8, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION Applicaton for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Zynga Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Motion to Approve Pro Hace Vice Admission, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Powell, William) Modified on 3/8/2011 - Attorney used wrong event - clerk corrected motion. (cmd)
March 8, 2011 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zynga Inc.. (Powell, William)
March 7, 2011 Filing 8 Zynga Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and, COUNTERCLAIM against Blingville, LLC by Zynga, Inc..(Powell, William)
February 14, 2011 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Deadline For Defendant Zynga to Respond to Complaint by Blingville, LLC. (Novotny, Michael)
January 28, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Zynga Game Network Inc. om 1/25/11. (cwm)
January 28, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Zynga, Inc. on 1/25/11. (cwm)
January 14, 2011 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re: 1 Complaint. (cwm)
January 14, 2011 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 350.00 - receipt number 064429. (cwm)
January 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Zynga Game Network Inc., and Zynga, Inc., filed by Blingville, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Emails, and # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blingville, LLC v. Zynga Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blingville, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Inc.
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Game Network Inc.
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Zynga Inc.
Represented By: William J. Powell
Represented By: Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Blingville, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?