Long et al v. M&M Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edy Long, Christopher Emmett Long and Christopher Tyler Long
Defendant: Miller & Sons Auto and Truck Repair, Inc., M&M Transportation, LLC, Kevin E. Miller, Kenneth Andrew Miller, Jr. and Peggy Miller
Case Number: 3:2013cv00065
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REVISED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: denying as moot 128 MOTION f or Summary Judgment PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56; denying 130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants M&M Transportation, LLC and Miller & Sons Auto and Truck Repair, Inc; and granting 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further ORDERS that this case be STRICKEN from this Courts active docket. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/5/2014. (cwm)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Confirming Pronounced Order of the Court Granting in Part and Denying in Part 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Granting 51 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to submit to Rule 35 Examinations. Written objections due within fourteen days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 1/22/2014. (cmd)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS denying 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C). Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/27/2013. (cwm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long et al v. M&M Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller & Sons Auto and Truck Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey A. Rohrbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&M Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Tracey A. Rohrbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin E. Miller
Represented By: Tracey A. Rohrbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Andrew Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Tracey A. Rohrbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Miller
Represented By: Tracey A. Rohrbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edy Long
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Brown
Represented By: Christopher J. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Emmett Long
Represented By: Christopher J. Regan
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Tyler Long
Represented By: Christopher J. Regan
Represented By: Geoffrey C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?