Burton v. Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Burton, Jr.
Defendant: Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Does 1 through 5
Case Number: 3:2018cv00131
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Mineral
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon review and consideration, the Parties' #6 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Plan is GRANTED. Defendant Ryder System, Inc.'s Group Disability Policy is DISMISSED from this matter WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on October 2, 2018. (hf)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extension of Time To File and Serve Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Delk, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Delk, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Delk, David)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, WVSOS accepted service on 9/10/2018. (cmd)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy, WVSOS accepted service on 9/10/2018. (cmd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy, Does 1 through 5, filed by Benjamin F. Burton, Jr. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-2646515. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Group Disability Income Policy, #3 Exhibit B - letter from SSA)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder System, Inc's Group Disability Policy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin F. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?