Aikens et al v. Merck & Co. Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Donna Aikens and Willard Aikens
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. and Merck & Co. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00143
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Case Transfer Complete - Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania on 09/24/2018. Eastern District of Pennsylvania's case number is 2:18-cv-20109. (cwm)
September 21, 2018 Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania re: MDL 2848. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (cwm)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) MDL No. 2848. 8 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in LAW/3:18-cv-01187, 88 in MDL No. 2848, 1 in NJ/2:18-cv-13262, 1 in NJ/2:18-cv-13540, 1 in NJ/2:18-cv-13548, 1 in NJ/3:18-cv-13767, 1 in NJ/3:18-cv-13796, 1 in NYE/2:18-cv-05125, 1 in WVN/3:18-cv-00143) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case is transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania and assigned to the Honorable Harvey Bartle, III. (Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk on 9/21/2018). (cwm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merck & Co. Inc., and Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., filed by Donna Aikens and Willard Aikens. Filing Fee $400.00 - Receipt #0424-2661580. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aikens et al v. Merck & Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Aikens
Represented By: Michael H. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willard Aikens
Represented By: Michael H. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?