Gonzalez v. TMC Trucking et al

Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Colton William Yoder and TMC Trucking
3Rd Party Defendant: Valentine Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00153
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Colton William Yoder Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant Colton William Yoder (Mayhew, Jonathan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TMC Trucking Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant TMC Trucking (Mayhew, Jonathan)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Mayhew, Jonathan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TMC Trucking. (Mayhew, Jonathan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valentine Electric, Inc.. (Nooney, Patrick)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Third Party Complaint by Valentine Electric, Inc..(Nooney, Patrick)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Valentine Electric, Inc. served on 9/26/2018 as to Third-Party Complaint. (cwm)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 09/27/2018. (cwm)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Third Party Complaint. ERROR: Attorney did not add new Third Party Defendant, Valentine Electric, Inc. CORRECTION: Deputy Clerk added Third Party Defendant and corrected style of case. (cmd)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jose Gonzalez, filed by Colton William Yoder, TMC Trucking.(Mayhew, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jose Gonzalez by Colton William Yoder, TMC Trucking.(Mayhew, Jonathan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number 18-C-280), filed by Colton William Yoder, and TMC Trucking. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2670852. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Matthew Paige, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Colton Yoder, and #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. TMC Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: Jared Matthew Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Colton William Yoder
Represented By: William L. Burner
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: TMC Trucking
Represented By: William L. Burner
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Valentine Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Nooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?