Hippler v. Bramble et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Wayne Hippler
Defendant: U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc., Benjamin J. Bramble and U.S. Xpress, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00006
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin J. Bramble Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Cline, Tyler)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Benjamin J. Bramble of Defendant Bramble'Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Cline, Tyler)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Lee Cline on behalf of All Defendants (Cline, Tyler)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 02/22/2019. (cwm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Revised Agreed by Benjamin J. Bramble. (O'Brien, Melvin)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION by Benjamin J. Bramble. (O'Brien, Melvin)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BreiAnne Varner Redd on behalf of All Defendants (Redd, BreiAnne)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Schultz, Lawrence)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER SUBSTITUTING CORRECT ENTITY. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 01/30/2019. (cwm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order Substituting Correct Entity by Andrew Wayne Hippler. (Schultz, Lawrence)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Benjamin J. Bramble, U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc..(O'Brien, Melvin)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 01/22/2019. (cwm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Morgan County, WV, (case number 18-C-46), filed by Benjamin J. Bramble and U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00 Receipt #0424-2737744. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, and #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hippler v. Bramble et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin F. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin J. Bramble
Represented By: Melvin F. O'Brien
Represented By: BreiAnne Varner Redd
Represented By: Tyler Lee Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin F. O'Brien
Represented By: BreiAnne Varner Redd
Represented By: Tyler Lee Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wayne Hippler
Represented By: Lawrence M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?