Mason v. Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC
Plaintiff: Brenda Mason
Defendant: Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00031
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 4/24/2019. (cmd)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document filed by Brenda Mason. (Matherly, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Matherly, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC.(Roskovensky, Vincent)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Cable Communications, LLC which is in turn wholly owned by Comcast Corporation for Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC.. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/5/2019. (cmd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Jeffrey Matherly. Mailed to attorney. (cmd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, (case number 18-C-361), filed by Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-2768884. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court docket sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Mason
Represented By: Jeffrey Matherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of California/Maryland/Pennsylvania/Virginia/West Virginia, LLC
Represented By: Vincent M. Roskovensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?