Vasallo v. Entzel

Petitioner: Angel Vasallo
Respondent: F. Entzel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00081
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/27/2019. (cmd)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/24/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Angel Vasallo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001511. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (cmd)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice, #2 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/24/2019. (cmd)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Mailed to pro se petitioner by cm,rr. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms)(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT as to Angel Vasallo. Copy mailed by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against F. Entzel, filed by Angel Vasallo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasallo v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Vasallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?