Jenkinson v. Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Jenkinson
Defendant: Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00083
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Highmark West Virginia, Inc.. (Hall, Jill)
June 11, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND re: #20 Notice (Other) filed by Mark Jenkinson. Copy emailed to E. Howell. (cwm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Mark Jenkinson Amended Notice of Filing of Surety Bond (Attachments: #1 Attachment Preliminary Injunction Bond)(Schultz, Lawrence)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND re: #18 NOTICE by Mark Jenkinson of Filing of Surety Bond. Copy emailed to E. Howell. (cwm)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Mark Jenkinson of Filing of Surety Bond (Attachments: #1 Attachment CNA Surety, #2 Attachment Injunction Bond)(Schultz, Lawrence)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/3/2019. (cmd)
June 2, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Highmark West Virginia, Inc. to #11 Response. (Hall, Jill)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 Other Document PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE MEMORANDUM filed by Mark Jenkinson. (Schultz, Lawrence)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: On May 30, 2019, the parties appeared before the Court for a hearing on the Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction. During the hearing, the Court took the Defendant's #9 Motion to Quash Subpoena under consideration. The Plaintiff conceded that service was improper. Accordingly, the Court GRANTED the Defendant's #9 motion to quash. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on May 31, 2019. (hf)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Chief Judge Gina M. Groh: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/30/2019. (Court Reporter: K. Slayden) (cwm)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Exhibit and Witness List re: evidentiary hearing.(cwm)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Highmark West Virginia, Inc. to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hall, Jill)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Highmark West Virginia, Inc.. (Hall, Jill)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Highmark West Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hall, Jill)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jill E. Hall (Hall, Jill)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Highmark West Virginia, Inc.. Highmark West Virginia, Inc. waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Hall, Jill)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill E. Hall on behalf of Highmark West Virginia, Inc. (Hall, Jill)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark Jenkinson. (Schultz, Lawrence)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Highmark West Virginia, Inc. served on 5/25/2019. (Schultz, Lawrence)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING HEARING. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/24/2019. (cmd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Highmark West Virginia, Inc., filed by Mark Jenkinson. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-2826877. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkinson v. Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jenkinson
Represented By: Lawrence M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highmark West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Jill E. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?