Riggleman v. Valley Health Urgent Care et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Riggleman
Defendant: Valley Health Urgent Care and David Bowers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Or for Summary Judgment, in Favor of Fraudulently Joined Defendant David Bowers filed by David Bowers, Valley Health Urgent Care. (Printz, Charles)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Dylan Riggleman Notice of Deposition (Staggers, Harley)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 02:00 PM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 08:30 AM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/23/2019. (tlg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Or for Summary Judgment, in Favor of Fraudulently Joined Defendant David Bowers filed by Dylan Riggleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Staggers, Harley)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Burner on behalf of David Bowers, Valley Health Urgent Care (Burner, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dylan Riggleman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Staggers, Harley)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Clerk to REINSTATE David Bowers as adefendant and reinstate Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or for SummaryJudgment, in Favor of Fraudulently-Joined Defendant David Bowers [Doc. 2]. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/16/2019. (tlg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 02:00 PM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/10/2020 08:30 AM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/16/2019. (tlg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Valley Health Urgent Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Printz, Charles) Modified on 7/15/2019 to add docket text. (cmd).
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney filed a corrected Response. Please see docket entry #10 for the correct version. (Printz, Charles) Modified on 7/15/2019 NEF regen. (cmd).
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Printz, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Printz, Charles)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dylan Riggleman re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended COS)(Staggers, Harley)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dylan Riggleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit October 12, 2019 Order, #2 Exhibit Pg. 70 of Rule 30(b)(7) Deposition, #3 Exhibit Pgs. 9-16 Dep. of B.Engle, #4 Exhibit Pgs. 147-150 Dep. of D. Riggleman, #5 Exhibit Pgs. 233-234 Dep. of D. Riggleman)(Staggers, Harley)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/10/2019. (cmd)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/7/2019. (tlg)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Or for Summary Judgment, in Favor of Fraudulently Joined Defendant David Bowers by David Bowers, Valley Health Urgent Care. Responses due by 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Printz, Charles) Modified on 7/16/2019 to unterm per #12 order (tlg).
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number 18-C-204), filed by Valley Health Urgent Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, docket sheet; #2 Exhibit B, amended complaint; #3 Exhibit C, affidavit of Charles F. Printz, Jr.; #4 Exhibit D, letter; #5 Exhibit E, declaration of Valley Regional Enterprises, Inc.; #6 Exhibit F, declaration of David Bowers; #7 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2834380(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggleman v. Valley Health Urgent Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Health Urgent Care
Represented By: Charles F. Printz, Jr.
Represented By: William L. Burner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bowers
Represented By: William L. Burner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Riggleman
Represented By: Harley O. Staggers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?