Glaspell v. Paugh et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Glaspell
Defendant: Jane Doe, CO Cordin, Ella Messinger, James Rubenstein and Scott Paugh
Case Number: 3:2019cv00099
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 Partial Filing fee: $10.08 - receipt number WVNE014285. (cwm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/26/2019. (tlg)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 7/23/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION AND INQUIRY re: #11 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY. by Daniel Lee Glaspell. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order on Motion for Leave to File. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/11/2019. (tlg)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 7/8/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct judge (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Discovery Upon Defendants, by Daniel Lee Glaspell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Partial Filing fee: $1.54 - receipt number WVNE014152. (cwm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/21/2019. (tlg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/17/2019. (tlg)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 6/18/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy of order and consent sent to trustee clerk and financial deputy.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daniel Lee Glaspell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ledger Sheets)(cmd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Daniel Lee Glaspell. (cmd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Lee Glaspell. (cmd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cordin, Jane Doe, Ella Messinger, Scott Paugh, James Rubenstein, filed by Daniel Lee Glaspell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1 - request dated 7/19/16, #4 Exhibit 2 -request dated 8/11/16, #5 Exhibit 3 - request dated 8/21/16, #6 Exhibit 4 - reqeust dated 8/26/16, #7 Exhibit 5 - request date 9/1/16, #8 Exhibit 6 - request dated 9/8/16, #9 Exhibit 7 - grievance dated 9/15/16, #10 Exhibit 8 - reqeust dated 9/15/16, #11 Exhibit 9 - frievance date 9/17/16, #12 Exhibit 10 - grievance dated 9/20/16, #13 Exhibit 11 - grievance 16MCC class 168, #14 Exhibit 12 - attachment to grievance, #15 Exhibit 13-request dated 9/29/16, #16 Exhibit 14 - request dated9/30/16, #17 Exhibit 15 - grievance 154, #18 Exhibit 16 - grievance 155, #19 Exhibit 17 - request 9/8/16, #20 Exhibit 18 - request 9/11/16, #21 Exhibit 19 - grievance with attached page, #22 Exhibit 20 - grievance 162, #23 Exhibit 21 - request 10/6/16, #24 Exhibit 22 - request 10/6/16, #25 Exhibit 23 - grievance 148, #26 Exhibit 24 - Unit response, #27 Exhibit 25 - grievance 149, #28 Exhibit 26 - grievance 150, #29 Exhibit 27 - grievance 151, #30 Exhibit 28 - grievance 152, #31 Exhibit 29 - grievance 153, #32 Exhibit 30 - grievance154, #33 Exhibit 31 - grievance 155, #34 Exhibit 32 - grievance 156, #35 Exhibit 33 - grievance158, #36 Exhibit 34 - grievance 159, #37 Exhibit 35 - Notes, #38 Exhibit 36 - Notes, #39 Exhibit 37 - Staff list, #40 Exhibit 38 - PSI Med return receipt, #41 Exhibit 39 - Paugh return receipt, #42 Exhibit 40 - Ruberstein return receipt, #43 Envelope)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaspell v. Paugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Cordin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Messinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Paugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Glaspell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?