Greene v. Plumley et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jermaine Greene
Defendant: Kenneth Wingfield, Andrew Hinchman, Timmy Cutright, Michael Mussi, Justin Close, Sidney Feaster, Cecil Pritt, Marvin C. Plumley and Richard Gsell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00102
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTIONS to #18 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR DISCOVERY AND SERVICE OF PROCESS, by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. GREENE filed by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 Southern District docket sheet, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope). Copy of docket sheet sent as requested.(tlg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN RECEIPT as to #18 Order on Public Motion. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/7/2019. (tlg)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR DISCOVERY AND SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER Requesting Copy of Complaint without Payment by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, and #2 Envelope) Copy of public docket sheet mailed to pro se plaintiff. (cwm) Modified on 8/5/2019 directed by Chambers (BS) to term motion and change to letter and send copy of the complaint. (cmd).
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to have the Court Serve Defendants and to Engage in Discovery by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Michael Greene to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from deputy clerk to Michael Greene regarding #13 Letter, #12 Letter. (tlg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from Michael Greene to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Michael Greene to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from deputy clerk to Michael J. Greene regarding #10 Declaration filed by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 docket sheet).(tlg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Michael J. Greene re #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 grievances, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope). Copy of docket sheet sent as requested.(tlg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/15/2019. (tlg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 07/12/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy mailed to West Virginia Division of Corrections. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/21/2019. (tlg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 inmate grievance forms) (tlg).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Close, Timmy Cutright, Sidney Feaster, Richard Gsell, Andrew Hinchman, Michael Mussi, Marvin C. Plumley, Cecil Pritt, Kenneth Wingfield, filed by Michael Jermaine Greene. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Plumley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hinchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmy Cutright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mussi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Feaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecil Pritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin C. Plumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jermaine Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?