Winland v. Jividen et al
Plaintiff: Charles Lewis Winland
Defendant: Lt. Myers, Betsy Jividen and Scott E. Paugh
Case Number: 3:2019cv00123
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/09/2019. (cwm)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 09/05/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/08/2019. (cwm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/05/2019. (cwm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 08/02/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Charles Lewis Winland. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles Lewis Winland. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Lewis Winland. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Betsy Jividen, Lt. Myers, and Scott E. Paugh, filed by Charles Lewis Winland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit affidavit and other exhibits, #2 Notice, and #3 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winland v. Jividen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott E. Paugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lewis Winland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?