Walker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lisha M. Walker
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00127
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/20/2019. (Miller, Travis)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 08/09/2019. (cwm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER. Upon review of the IFP, the Court finds it to be incomplete. It was dated but not signed by the Defendant. Accordingly, the IFP Application is TERMINATED at this time and Defendant is GRANTED leave to refile an executed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9-7-2019. (dh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisha M. Walker. (cwm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lisha M. Walker. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisha M. Walker
Represented By: Travis M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?