Green v. Trinity Food Service et al
Plaintiff: Todd Mitchell Green
Defendant: Trinity Food Service, Val Ruthig and Karen Radcliff
Case Number: 3:2019cv00128
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/16/2019. (tlg)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/10/2019. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/15/2019. (tlg)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/12/2019. (tlg)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/12/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case per #6 order. (tlg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/12/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Todd Mitchell Green. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheet, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Todd Mitchell Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd Mitchell Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen Radcliff, Val Ruthig, Trinity Food Service, filed by Todd Mitchell Green. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, declaration/affidavit; #2 Attachment B, declaration/affidavit; #3 grievance form; #4 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Trinity Food Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Mitchell Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Food Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val Ruthig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?