Sellman v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Shante Sellman
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00148
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO PERMIT JOINDER OF THREE PLAINTIFFS AND TWO DEFENDANTS filed by Shante Sellman. (Skinner, Stephen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 Mail sent to Shante Sellman #3 Notice (Other) Returned as Undeliverable (unclaimed). (tlg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO PERMIT JOINDER OF THREE PLAINTIFFS AND TWO DEFENDANTS filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Shepard, Katherine)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/24/2019. (tlg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Order Checklist)(Shepard, Katherine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Shante Sellman re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Skinner, Stephen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Shante Sellman re #14 MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO PERMIT JOINDER OF THREE PLAINTIFFS AND TWO DEFENDANTS . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q)(Skinner, Stephen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO PERMIT JOINDER OF THREE PLAINTIFFS AND TWO DEFENDANTS by Shante Sellman. (Skinner, Stephen)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit), #2 Exhibit B (Maryland Complaint))(Shepard, Katherine)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Shepard, Katherine)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC, Corporate Parent PNMAC Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent PennyMac Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Mortgage Ventures, LLC for PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.. (Shepard, Katherine)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G. Skinner on behalf of Shante Sellman (Skinner, Stephen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shante Sellman re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (tlg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Shante Sellman. (Attachments: #1 fax cover sheet).(tlg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff with Prejudice, by Shante Sellman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Defendant's answer to complaint; #2 Exhibit B, deed; #3 fax cover sheet).(tlg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Shepard, Katherine)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Shepard, Katherine)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/18/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNM001557 (tlg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number CC-02-2019-C-296), filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, state court documents; #2 Exhibit B, state court docket sheet; #3 Civil Cover Sheet).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellman v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shante Sellman
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?