Brewer v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Delphonso O. Brewer
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00149
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/21/2019. (tlg)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/17/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Delphonso O. Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/15/2019) (tlg).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Delphonso O. Brewer. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/1/2019. (tlg)
September 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case per #7 order. (tlg)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/26/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/19/2019. (tlg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Delphonso O. Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Delphonso O. Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, filed by Delphonso O. Brewer. (Attachments: #1 memorandum, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and LC Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delphonso O. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?