Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Dove Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Colonial American Casualty and Surety Company
Defendant: Barr Jen Hauling, Inc., Brenda Pruett, Jena L. McDonald, Barry R. McDonald, Carl W. Pruett and Dove Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00151
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brenda Pruett served on 10/17/2019. (Hulett, Eric)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carl W. Pruett served on 10/17/2019. (Hulett, Eric)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jena L. McDonald served on 10/17/2019. (Hulett, Eric)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Barry R. McDonald served on 10/17/2019. (Hulett, Eric)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dove Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/17/2019. (Hulett, Eric)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Barr Jen Hauling, Inc. served on 10/16/2019. (tlg)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dove Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/16/2019. (tlg)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon review and finding good cause, Plaintiff Zurich American Insurance Company's #7 Motion for Leave to Restrict Exhibit F is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to seal the originally filed Exhibit F and file the redacted version as an attachment to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on October 1, 2019. (hf)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hulett, Eric)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Other Document Motion for Leave to Restrict Exhibit F filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hulett, Eric)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Hulett, Eric)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric J. Hulett (Hulett, Eric)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S PAPERLESS NOTICE: Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov on 9/13/2019. However, filer failed to complete filing process, following receipt of payment. Clerk's office notified filer of the incomplete document filing and complaint was received on 9/16/2019. (cmd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Barr Jen Hauling, Inc., Dove Enterprises, Inc., Barry R. McDonald, Jena L. McDonald, Brenda Pruett, Carl W. Pruett, filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company, Colonial American Casualty and Surety Company. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt # 0424-2899904. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Business Entity Details for Dove, #2 Exhibit B - Business Entity Details for Barr Jen, #3 Exhibit C - AOI, #4 Exhibit D - Bond, #5 Exhibit E - BCPC Claim on Bond, #6 Exhibit F - Check, #7 Exhibit G&H - Letter & letter/email, #8 Exhibit I - Release and Assignment)(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #10 Exhibit F - REDACTED check) (cmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Dove Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Jen Hauling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Pruett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jena L. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry R. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl W. Pruett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dove Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonial American Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?