Samuels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jessica Monique Samuels
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00153
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney NDWV)(cwm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/08/2019. (cwm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/01/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/24/2019. (cwm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessica Monique Samuels. (cwm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jessica Monique Samuels. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, and #2 Proposed Summons)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samuels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Monique Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?