Draper v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Angelo Draper
Respondent: Warden Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00155
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/31/2019. (tlg)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/28/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF by Hudgins re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Prezioso, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hudgins. (Prezioso, Christopher)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Prezioso on behalf of Hudgins (Prezioso, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/30/2019. (tlg)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/27/2019. Copy sent to AUSA; copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002719 (tlg) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/26/2019) (tlg).
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2019 per USPS website. (tlg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden Hudgins, filed by Angelo Draper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and Law Clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angelo Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Hudgins
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Christopher James Prezioso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?