Bennett v. Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC
Plaintiff: Susan A. Bennett
Defendant: Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00157
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Other Document filed by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC. (Thompson, Chelsea)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC. (Thompson, Chelsea)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/31/2019. (cwm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC. (Thompson, Chelsea)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Susan A. Bennett. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/01/2019. (cwm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC.(Thompson, Chelsea)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Chelsea)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC. (Thompson, Chelsea)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Berkeley County Circuit Court, (case number 19-C-297), filed by Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court docs, #3 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #4 Attachment State Court Docket Sheet)(cmd) Modified on 9/19/2019 Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2904440 (cmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkway Neuroscience and Spine Institute, LLC
Represented By: Debra Lee Allen
Represented By: H. Dill Battle, III
Represented By: Chelsea E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan A. Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey V. Mehalic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?