Pratt v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Roy Dean Pratt
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00162
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/22/2019. (tlg)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/19/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by R. Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tighe, Tara)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/1/2019. (tlg)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Noel Tighe on behalf of R. Hudgins (Tighe, Tara) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/7/2019 with PDF version) (tlg).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/30/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner; copy to AUSA.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001581 (tlg)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/18/2019. (tlg)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCDEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/16/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roy Dean Pratt. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy Dean Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other), #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/4/2019. (tlg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Mailed with forms to pro se petitioner by cm,rrr. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form)(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed to pro se petitioner by cm,rr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, filed by Roy Dean Pratt. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Application, #2 Envelope)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Tara Noel Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roy Dean Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?