Kuhbander v. John Doe #1 et al
Plaintiff: Norman Kuhbander
Defendant: John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, Segregated Housing Unit Lieutenant, Captain Yeager and Lieutenant W. Moulton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00167
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney General. served on 11/29/2019. (cwm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order to Answer as to US Attorney General. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/29/2019. (cwm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of WV served on 11/25/2019. (tlg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order to Answer as to Norman Kuhbander. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/25/2019. (cwm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXCEED. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/22/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/21/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff, US Attorney NDWV and US Attorney General by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXCEED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/19/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Initial partial filing fee: $ 14.36, receipt number WVNE014701 (tlg)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/15/2019. (cwm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/15/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/09/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mail/emailed E. Howell and Trustee Officer. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Norman Kuhbander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Norman Kuhbander. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Norman Kuhbander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Norman Kuhbander. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, filed by Norman Kuhbander. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Norman Kuhbander, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and Law Clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhbander v. John Doe #1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Segregated Housing Unit Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant W. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Kuhbander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?