Pendleton v. USA
Petitioner: Ricky Vincent Pendleton
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00170
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re #6 Notice of Appeal. (tlg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal. (tlg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), by Ricky Vincent Pendleton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/4/2019. (cmd)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT ANY MISCONSTRUING NOTIONS FOR THE RECORD: BASED ON A PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b)(4)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (motion filed in criminal case only). As the petitioner has notified this Court that this was not his intent, the 2255 petition [Civ. Doc. #1 ] is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and ORDERED STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/31/2019. Copy to pro se petitioner by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Paperless Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/15/2019. (cmd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE - This civil case is opened for statistical purposes only and all docketing is to be done in criminal case 3:96cr1. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (tlg). Modified on 10/21/2019 to add: CMRR #7019 0700 0000 1765 3237 (tlg).
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Ricky Vincent Pendleton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Ryan Frankenberry's written statement; #2 Exhibit B, federal grand jury transcripts; #3 Exhibit C, photocopies; #4 cover letter; #5 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ James Mazzone and law clerk Blalock.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendleton v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Paul T. Camilletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Vincent Pendleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?