Nassif et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Nassif, Kim Nassif and Matthew Nassif
Defendant: Lance Dore, Jane or John Does 2-10, Timothy Matthews, Sandra Burns, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Jane or John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2019cv00171
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/4/2019. (cmd)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Sandra Burns, Jane or John Doe 1, Jane or John Does 2-10, Lance Dore, Timothy Matthews. (Kime, Evan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Sandra Burns, Jane or John Doe 1, Jane or John Does 2-10, Lance Dore, Timothy Matthews. (Kime, Evan)
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lance Dore MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lance Dore. (Kime, Evan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form Scheduling Order Checklist)(Fitzsimmons, Clayton)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lance Dore MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kim Nassif, Matthew Nassif, Michael Nassif. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Skinner, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kim Nassif, Matthew Nassif, Michael Nassif. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Skinner, Andrew)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan R. Kime on behalf of All Defendants (Kime, Evan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (Hulett, Eric)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hulett, Eric)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant Lance Dore by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lance Dore MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Hulett, Eric)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lance Dore, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hulett, Eric)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/18/2019. (cmd)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hulett, Eric)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Colantonio on behalf of Kim Nassif, Matthew Nassif, Michael Nassif (Colantonio, Mark)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Fitzsimmons on behalf of Kim Nassif, Matthew Nassif, Michael Nassif (Fitzsimmons, Robert)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton J Fitzsimmons on behalf of Kim Nassif, Matthew Nassif, Michael Nassif (Fitzsimmons, Clayton)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/10/2019. (cmd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cmd)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, (case number 19-C-325), filed by Sandra Burns, Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Timothy Matthews, Jane or John Does 2-10, Jane or John Doe 1, Lance Dore. Filing Fee $400 PAID, Receipt #0424-2916415. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SOS webpage, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Sheet)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nassif et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Dore
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Evan R. Kime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Does 2-10
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Evan R. Kime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Matthews
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Evan R. Kime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Burns
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Evan R. Kime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Evan R. Kime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe 1
Represented By: Eric J. Hulett
Represented By: Evan R. Kime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nassif
Represented By: Laura C. Davis
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Clayton J Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Mark A. Colantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Nassif
Represented By: Laura C. Davis
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Clayton J Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Mark A. Colantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Nassif
Represented By: Laura C. Davis
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Clayton J Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Mark A. Colantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?