Smith v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Wayne Smith
Defendant: Weaver and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00179
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE LEDGER SHEETS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/13/2019. Copy mailed to ro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
December 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ledger sheets by Nathan Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/18/2019. (tlg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/15/2019. Copy sent certified mail return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy to office of warden.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathan Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 general ledger, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Nathan Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 Complaint filed by Nathan Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/29/2019. (tlg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00322. (tlg)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Transferring Case. See Order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 10/21/2019. Copy of Order mailed by chambers to pro se plaintiff. (hfh) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/22/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, Weaver, filed by Nathan Wayne Smith. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 1/6/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/6/2020. (kjw) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 10/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?