Bone v. Lai et al
Plaintiff: Lavell Bone
Defendant: Dr. Ben Stephens, W.V. University Hospitals, Dr. Lingo Lai and WVU Medicine - Eye Institute
Case Number: 3:2019cv00214
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/15/2020 as per USPS website. (tlg)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Trustee Clerk regarding #9 Order, #10 Filing Fee Received. (copy Plaintiff; Trustee Clerk w/check) (cnd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 VOIDED per #9 Order: Initial partial filing fee: $ 9.16, receipt number WVNE014898 (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2020: #1 Voided Receipt) (cnd). Money returned to institution. (cnd).
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 1/9/2020. Copy of order and court-approved forms sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 01/03/2020. (cwm)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 01/03/2020. (cwm)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VACATED based on Order entered on 1/9/2020. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/30/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy to financial deputy; copy of order and consent to trustee clerk.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). Modified docket text on 1/9/2020 (tlg).
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Plaintiff)(cnd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Account Report by Lavell Bone. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry sheets, #2 Envelope)(cnd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Lavell Bone. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION/APPLICATION and Affidavit to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees by Lavell Bone. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lingo Lai, Ben Stephens, W.V. University Hospitals, WVU Medicine - Eye Institute, filed by Lavell Bone. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Remedies - paperwork, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)[Groh/Trumble/Sims](cnd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/13/2020 to include file stamp) (cnd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bone v. Lai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavell Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ben Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.V. University Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lingo Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WVU Medicine - Eye Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?