Quinones-Cedeno v. Resh et al
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Defendant: Paul Adams, Ms. K. Bankson and Ms. Jennifer Resh
Case Number: 3:2020cv00050
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Declaration filed in case 1:19-CV-64, #2 Letter, and #3 Envelope)(cwm)
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 05/11/2020 per USPS website. (cwm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno to Clerk, US District Court re: initial partial filing fee requesting docket sheet. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Copy of public docket sheet mailed to pro se petitioner. (cwm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 Mail sent to Trustee Clerk FCI Hazelton #11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward. Re-mailed to FCI Hazelton. (cwm)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 04/23/2020. (cwm)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 04/17/2020. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent email/mailed to E. Howell and Trustee Clerk. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno to United States District Court re: status of case. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Copy of public docket sheet mailed to pro se plaintiff. (cwm)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 03/23/2020 per USPS website. (cwm)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) No ledger sheets were submitted. (cwm)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Adams, K. Bankson, and Jennifer Resh, filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Medical Records, #2 Exhibit B - Remedy Appeal, and #3 Envelope) Attachment 1 restricted per GMG Chambers (JO) contains e-gov violations. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones-Cedeno v. Resh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. K. Bankson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Jennifer Resh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?